U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00879
  • Case Name: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Dexcel Pharma Technologies Limited, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Parties and their Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.