U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-01247
  • Case Name: Media Content Protection LLC v. Realtek Semiconductor Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Discovery Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 11, 2024: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.