U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-01240
  • Case Name: Media Content Protection LLC v. Dell Technologies, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case No Longer Referred]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2024: [Counterclaim]
  • October 11, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 11, 2024: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.