U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-01672
  • Case Name: Caporale et al v. EIDP, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 15, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule - open, ans, reply, surreply]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 18, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Letter]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.