U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Durr Systems, Inc. v. Nevoa Life Sciences Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Deposition Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Teleconference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Declaration]
  • October 14, 2024: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • October 14, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.