U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01115
  • Case Name: Tecan Genomics, Inc. v. QIAGEN Sciences, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 09, 2025: [Appendix]
  • May 09, 2025: [Joint Claim Construction Brief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.