U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00756
  • Case Name: Aerin Medical Inc. et al v. Neurent Medical Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [- Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.