U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Viasat, Inc. v. Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 23, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • March 13, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.