U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-mc-00258
  • Case Name: In Re: The Application of Amgen Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 26, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.