U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warren et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.