U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Sonos, Inc. v. Linkplay Technology Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 08, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 08, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Brief - Sur-Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.