U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Copeland v. Netflix, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
  • May 07, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint - Amended]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.