U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00248
  • Case Name: ADMA Biologics, Inc. v. Leinco Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 12, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 12, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.