U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00298
  • Case Name: Holton et al v. Igloo Products Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 03, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 31, 2025: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [No Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.