U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01275
  • Case Name: Coupa Software Inc. et al v. Optilogic, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Discovery Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Redacted Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 21, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 17, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to -]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.