U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Debbs et al v. CDK Fund I SPV, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 02, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 02, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.