U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10461-
  • Case Name: Taisha M. Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [341 Meeting Held and Concluded]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Confirmation Hearing Continued]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Request for Service of Notices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Rescheduled 341 Meeting - Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [341 Meeting Not Held and Continued]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Certification About a Financial Management Course]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Request for Service of Notices]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [none]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jaworski, William F [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.