U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50413-
  • Case Name: Carickhoff v. DEPALMA STUDIOS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of No Objection(Multi)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary)]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [none]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [RETIRED - Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.