U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10463-
  • Case Name: KSV Restructuring Inc., in its capacity as trustee and Bench Accounting, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Sell Property]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certification of Counsel(Aty)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Hearing - Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Authorize]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certification of Counsel(Aty)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Authorize]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Motion for Joint Administration]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [none]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Add Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Case Assigned]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Standing Order/Transcripts]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens- Motion (FEE)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Authorize - Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Memorandum of Law]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Declaration]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Exhibit]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Joint Administration - Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.