U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00321
  • Case Name: DemeRx, Inc. v. ATAI Life Sciences AG et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 03, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.