U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00229
  • Case Name: VTT Technical Research Centre of Finland Ltd. v. HID Global Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to -]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.