U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Chatham Financial Corp. v. Milhaus, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to -]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.