U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea and Sentence]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.