U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Sheeler v. Real Brands, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint - Pro Se Non-Prisoner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.