U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Liberty CLO Holdco, Ltd. v. Dondero et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 25, 2025: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • March 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.