U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Yangjiang Xinhe Houseware Co., Ltd. v. Telebrands Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 25, 2025: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • April 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 23, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 26, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 26, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 25, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • March 25, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.