U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Monroe et al v. FTS USA, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 27, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 25, 2025: [No Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.