U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00245
  • Case Name: R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company v. Sheridan, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 17, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.