U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00094
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 530 Berne Road, Columbia Falls, Montana 59912
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.