U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00179
  • Case Name: United Parcel Service of America, Inc. et al v. Labrie
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • March 31, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 28, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 27, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.