U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Davies US Inc. v. Weston et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.