U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Powell v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Return of Property]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.