U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00922
  • Case Name: ATB Marine, LLC v. AES Puerto Rico, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.