U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00418
  • Case Name: HydraFacial LLC v. Candela Corporation, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • May 01, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 04, 2025: [Multi Media Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 04, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • April 04, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.