U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00687
  • Case Name: Guardant Health, Inc. v. Tempus AI, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 10, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 10, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.