U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00429
  • Case Name: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 07, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.