U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01288
  • Case Name: UMBRA Technologies Ltd. (UK) et al v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark (CJB Courtesy Copy Requirement)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark re Newer Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 15, 2025: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • April 15, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 14, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.