U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00456
  • Case Name: Addison v. Mars Petcare US, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 30, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 16, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.