U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.