U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00659-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FOREMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 13, 2022: [Vacate]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • June 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.