U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00658-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAYNE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • May 12, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • March 11, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Suppress]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Bond ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • November 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.