U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00657-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Probation Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2022: [Strike ]
February, 2022
  • February 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.