U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00139
  • Case Name: DOTY et al v. ADT, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Declaration]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Declaration]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • December 01, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 01, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Errata]
  • November 12, 2021: [Quash]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.