U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00124
  • Case Name: BARTH v. UNITED STATES et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.