U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00660-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORRISSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 16, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Bond ]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.