U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00140
  • Case Name: AMPERSAND PUBLISHING, LLC v. NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 03, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion For Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [USCA Order (No Link)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.