U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00639-2
  • Case Name: USA v. BAQUERO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.