U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00665-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Information - Felony]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [.Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.