U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00664-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCRUGGS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.