U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00667-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENTSCHEL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Quash ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 29, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 07, 2022: [Probation Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Voluntarily Surrender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Voluntarily Surrender]
  • October 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 18, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.